NY A08486 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - amended on third reading 8486b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - amended on third reading 8486b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to due process procedures for persons who currently are placed in New York state education department approved out-of-state residential schools pursuant to the education law and the federal individuals with disabilities education act who have received an offer for transitional care or certain care prior to becoming eligible to receive such care.
Title
Relates to due process procedures for persons who currently are placed in New York state education department approved out-of-state residential schools pursuant to the education law and the federal individuals with disabilities education act who have received an offer for transitional care or certain care prior to becoming eligible to receive such care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly People With Disabilities Committee: Favorable (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly People With Disabilities Committee: Favorable (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8486b |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | amend by restoring to original print 8486 |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 8486a |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2022-03-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | recalled from senate |
2022-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.297 |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to people with disabilities |
2021-11-17 | Assembly | referred to people with disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S08355 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - PRINT NUMBER 8355B