NY A08485 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - approval memo.6
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - approval memo.6
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to child abuse in an educational setting; requires the commissioner of education to promulgate rules and regulations for training of, at a minimum, information regarding the physical and behavioral indicators of child abuse and maltreatment and certain statutory reporting requirements; and extends such provisions to private schools and such employees and volunteers within.
Title
Relates to child abuse in an educational setting; requires the commissioner of education to promulgate rules and regulations for training of, at a minimum, information regarding the physical and behavioral indicators of child abuse and maltreatment and certain statutory reporting requirements; and extends such provisions to private schools and such employees and volunteers within.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Senate | approval memo.6 |
2018-12-07 | Senate | signed chap.363 |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-05-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.348 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7372B |
2018-03-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8485b |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.696 |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | reported |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | print number 8485a |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07372 (Same As) 2018-05-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8485B