NY A08483 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - SIGNED CHAP.302
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - SIGNED CHAP.302
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Christopher R. Sniffen and Cody N. Whittaker to receive certain service credit under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law.
Title
Authorizes Christopher R. Sniffen and Cody N. Whittaker to receive certain service credit under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.302 |
2020-11-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Senate | home rule request |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.313 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a8483a |
2020-07-23 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.895 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-05-01 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8216A |
2020-05-01 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-04-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s8216a |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.313 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.313 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | print number 8483a |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-08-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08216 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - SIGNED CHAP.302