NY A08482 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires landlords to mitigate damages when commercial tenants vacate premises in violation of the terms of the lease.
Title
Requires landlords to mitigate damages when commercial tenants vacate premises in violation of the terms of the lease.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] |
Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.180 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.180 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-08-07 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07053 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY