NY A08474 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - print number 8474a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - print number 8474a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the computation of the New York city corporate tax on real estate investment trusts and regulated investment companies.
Title
Provides for the computation of the New York city corporate tax on real estate investment trusts and regulated investment companies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Assembly | print number 8474a |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06627 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES