NY A08474 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - approval memo.32
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for notification to the state when a foster home is decertified, not renewed or a child is removed; requires evaluation to determine if certificate should be issued and the home be re-opened.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for notification to the state when a foster home is decertified, not renewed or a child is removed; requires evaluation to determine if certificate should be issued and the home be re-opened.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-29Senateapproval memo.32
2014-12-29Senatesigned chap.539
2014-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2014-06-16SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-16SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-06-16Senate3RD READING CAL.1403
2014-06-16SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6875
2014-03-20SenateREFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
2014-03-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2014-03-20Assemblypassed assembly
2014-02-20Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.460
2014-02-11Assemblyreported
2014-01-16Assemblyreferred to children and families

Same As/Similar To

S06875 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8474

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback