NY A08473 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s7493a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s7493a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a person who has suffered interference with the use and enjoyment of private property or public parkland by a rotorcraft used in a manner that creates an unreasonable level of noise at ground level to have a right of action against a person who caused or contributed to the use of such rotorcraft in such manner; relates to the use of certain heliports in the city of New York.
Title
Allows a person who has suffered interference with the use and enjoyment of private property or public parkland by a rotorcraft used in a manner that creates an unreasonable level of noise at ground level to have a right of action against a person who caused or contributed to the use of such rotorcraft in such manner; relates to the use of certain heliports in the city of New York.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] |
Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Zohran Kwame Mamdani [D] | Asm. Marcela Mitaynes [D] | Asm. Phara Souffrant Forrest [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s7493a |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.698 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | print number 8473a |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-11-17 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07493 (Same As) 2022-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.107