NY A08468 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - print number 8468a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - print number 8468a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the investment of funds wagered on video lottery gaming for certain horse races.
Title
Relates to the investment of funds wagered on video lottery gaming for certain horse races.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Assembly | print number 8468a |
2022-03-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-11-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08485 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING