NY A08462 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - print number 8462b
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - print number 8462b
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "earned time act" providing for time allowances against the term or maximum term of sentences imposed by the court to be credited on an annual pro rata basis.
Title
Establishes the "earned time act" providing for time allowances against the term or maximum term of sentences imposed by the court to be credited on an annual pro rata basis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | Assembly | print number 8462b |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2021-12-15 | Assembly | print number 8462a |
2021-12-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2021-11-17 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S07873 (Same As) 2022-01-21 - PRINT NUMBER 7873A