NY A08460 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an official inspection station to post a sign or poster informing customers that it is not authorized to inspect an altered motor vehicle unless the registrant presents a state DOT exemption letter, otherwise such vehicle shall report to the Department of Transportation.
Title
Requires an official inspection station to post a sign or poster informing customers that it is not authorized to inspect an altered motor vehicle unless the registrant presents a state DOT exemption letter, otherwise such vehicle shall report to the Department of Transportation.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.548 |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | print number 8460a |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-11-17 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07555 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - PRINT NUMBER 7555A