NY A08460 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - print number 8460a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - print number 8460a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of transportation to conduct a comprehensive study on designation of private roads on the University at Buffalo North Campus and public roads in the town of Amherst for the purposes of autonomous vehicle technology testing.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of transportation to conduct a comprehensive study on designation of private roads on the University at Buffalo North Campus and public roads in the town of Amherst for the purposes of autonomous vehicle technology testing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Assembly | print number 8460a |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06052 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES