NY A08456 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - substituted by s8170
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - substituted by s8170
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates room three hundred one of the Putnam supreme and county court as the "Judge James F. Reitz Memorial Courtroom".
Title
Designates room three hundred one of the Putnam supreme and county court as the "Judge James F. Reitz Memorial Courtroom".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Assembly | substituted by s8170 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.324 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 8456b |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-12-08 | Assembly | print number 8456a |
2021-12-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2021-11-17 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S08170 (Same As) 2022-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.712