NY A08445 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - print number 8445b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - print number 8445b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits possession of an image of a minor victim by child sex offenders and prohibits any other person from disseminating to such person any image of a child victim of such sex offense.
Title
Prohibits possession of an image of a minor victim by child sex offenders and prohibits any other person from disseminating to such person any image of a child victim of such sex offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Assembly | print number 8445b |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | print number 8445a |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06021 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - PRINT NUMBER 6021B