NY A08443 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - print number 8443a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - print number 8443a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that rape in the first degree shall be a class A-I felony and shall be punishable by life imprisonment without parole.
Title
Provides that rape in the first degree shall be a class A-I felony and shall be punishable by life imprisonment without parole.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | Assembly | print number 8443a |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06151 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - PRINT NUMBER 6151A