NY A08431 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 29 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-30 - substituted by s7830a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a fiscal cliff task force to conduct a study on fiscal cliffs in the state's public assistance programs and to make recommendations related thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a fiscal cliff task force to conduct a study on fiscal cliffs in the state's public assistance programs and to make recommendations related thereto.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-30Assemblysubstituted by s7830a
2024-05-30Assemblyrules report cal.256
2024-05-30Assemblyreported
2024-05-28Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-05-17Assemblyprint number 8431a
2024-05-17Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2024-02-27Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to social services
2023-12-29Assemblyreferred to social services

Same As/Similar To

S07830 (Same As) 2024-11-22 - VETOED MEMO.65

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A8431
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08431&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08431
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08431&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08431A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08431&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08431&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08431&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback