NY A08429 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - print number 8429a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - print number 8429a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides state aid for certain special education services for children with autism spectrum disorder in preschool.
Title
Provides state aid for certain special education services for children with autism spectrum disorder in preschool.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Assembly | print number 8429a |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S06273 (Same As) 2018-03-29 - PRINT NUMBER 6273A