NY A08418 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the council on children and families to establish an online listing and map of publicly funded or registered afterschool and school age child care programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the council on children and families to establish an online listing and map of publicly funded or registered afterschool and school age child care programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-29Senatetabled
2014-12-29Senatevetoed memo.572
2014-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2014-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1669
2014-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6553A
2014-06-18SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2014-06-18Senatereturned to senate
2014-06-18Assemblyrepassed assembly
2014-06-12Assemblyamended on third reading 8418a
2014-06-12Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2014-06-12Senaterecalled from senate
2014-03-10SenateREFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
2014-03-10Assemblydelivered to senate
2014-03-10Assemblypassed assembly
2014-03-06Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.489
2014-03-04Assemblyreported
2014-01-15Assemblyreferred to children and families

Same As/Similar To

S06553 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8418A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback