NY A08409 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-07 - print number 8409a
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-07 - print number 8409a
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires electric vehicle charging stations to be installed at gasoline stations in an amount equal to or greater than the number of new gas dispensing motor fuel pumps being installed at such gasoline station; prohibits building permits from being issued when the number of electric vehicle charging stations is not equal to or greater than the number of new gas dispensing motor fuel pumps being installed at such gas station.
Title
Requires electric vehicle charging stations to be installed at gasoline stations in an amount equal to or greater than the number of new gas dispensing motor fuel pumps being installed at such gasoline station; prohibits building permits from being issued when the number of electric vehicle charging stations is not equal to or greater than the number of new gas dispensing motor fuel pumps being installed at such gas station.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-07 | Assembly | print number 8409a |
2022-01-07 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2021-10-20 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S06692 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - referred to consumer affairs and protection