NY A08409 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of interim multiple dwelling units; authorizes claims originating in the loft board to be brought in civil court; amends how rents in interim dwelling units are controlled; subjects cooperative and condominium units to certain rent regulations.
Title
Amends the definition of interim multiple dwelling units; authorizes claims originating in the loft board to be brought in civil court; amends how rents in interim dwelling units are controlled; subjects cooperative and condominium units to certain rent regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8409b |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.603 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.632 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.632 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | print number 8409a |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S06828 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - PRINT NUMBER 6828B