NY A08404 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - substituted by s7417
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - substituted by s7417
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Waives the residency requirement for the city attorney in the city of Johnstown, Fulton county.
Title
Waives the residency requirement for the city attorney in the city of Johnstown, Fulton county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Assembly | substituted by s7417 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.241 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-10-20 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07417 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.320