NY A08399 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - print number 8399a
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - print number 8399a
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the creation of an ATV trail fund.
Title
Relates to the creation of an ATV trail fund.
Sponsors
Asm. Anthony Brindisi [D] | Asm. Janet Duprey [R] | Asm. Kenneth Blankenbush [R] | Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] |
Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. William Barclay [R] | Asm. William Magee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Assembly | print number 8399a |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2015-10-02 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S05821 (Same As) 2016-02-22 - PRINT NUMBER 5821A