NY A08389 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-29 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-29 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the election of regents.
Title
Relates to the election of regents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-29 | Assembly | held for consideration in education |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | print number 8389a |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S06377 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES