NY A08388 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the nurse-family partnership program is not within the definition of home care.
Title
Clarifies that the nurse-family partnership program is not within the definition of home care.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. Jaime Williams [D] | Asm. Aravella Simotas [D] |
Asm. Joseph Morelle [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Barbara Lifton [D] | Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-29 | Senate | tabled |
2017-12-29 | Senate | vetoed memo.234 |
2017-12-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1930 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6656 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.461 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.461 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06656 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8388