NY A08386 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the construction of facilities for chemical dependence services that promote the privacy of individuals while bathing, sleeping, using restrooms and receiving individual counseling services, while also allowing for maximization of the use of such facility.
Title
Relates to the construction of facilities for chemical dependence services that promote the privacy of individuals while bathing, sleeping, using restrooms and receiving individual counseling services, while also allowing for maximization of the use of such facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-28 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-12-28 | Assembly | vetoed memo.178 |
2022-12-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1093 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7349A |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.240 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.240 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 8386a |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2021-10-20 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S07349 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8386A