NY A08373 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-24 - advanced to third reading cal.641
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-24 - advanced to third reading cal.641
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the discount buying club consumer protection act.
Title
Enacts the discount buying club consumer protection act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.641 |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2012-05-09 | Assembly | print number 8373a |
2012-05-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2012-01-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |