NY A08371 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-06 - print number 8371c
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-06 - print number 8371c
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the disposition of campaign funds raised by an elected official who has been convicted of a crime committed while in public office or has been impeached and has been convicted, or has resigned public office following findings by either the attorney general or a committee of the legislature that the official has violated the law.
Title
Relates to the disposition of campaign funds raised by an elected official who has been convicted of a crime committed while in public office or has been impeached and has been convicted, or has resigned public office following findings by either the attorney general or a committee of the legislature that the official has violated the law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 8371c |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to election law |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | print number 8371b |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to election law |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2021-12-22 | Assembly | print number 8371a |
2021-12-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2021-10-20 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S07874 (Same As) 2022-05-06 - PRINT NUMBER 7874B