NY A08349 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-4)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s5612a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to protection of certain streams; adds class C streams to the list of protected streams.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to protection of certain streams; adds class C streams to the list of protected streams.

Sponsors

Asm. Sean Ryan [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]
Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]
Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Steve Stern [D]Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]Asm. William Magnarelli [D]
Asm. Michael Cusick [D]Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]
Asm. Patrick Burke [D]Asm. Karen McMahon [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]
Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]
Asm. Judy Griffin [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]
Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]Asm. Michael Miller [D]Asm. John McDonald [D]Asm. Walter Mosley [D]
Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]
Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]Asm. Andrew Raia [R]
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Didi Barrett [D]
Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Edward Ra [R]
Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]
Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Colin Schmitt [R]Asm. Jacob Ashby [R]Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]
Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. David Buchwald [D]
Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]
Asm. Nick Perry [D]

Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s5612a
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.536
2019-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.536
2019-06-18Assemblyreported
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-15Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S05612 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback