NY A08347 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - print number 8347a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - print number 8347a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force on missing women and girls who are black, indigenous and people of color (BIPOC) to develop policy changes that will work to address the lack of care and concern for missing and murdered BIPOC women and girls with New York state governmental agencies.
Title
Establishes a task force on missing women and girls who are black, indigenous and people of color (BIPOC) to develop policy changes that will work to address the lack of care and concern for missing and murdered BIPOC women and girls with New York state governmental agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Assembly | print number 8347a |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-10-20 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06924 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES