NY A08339 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - substituted by s7378a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - substituted by s7378a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health to publish certain reports on the department's website detailing sales of opioids sold in the state; requires the department of health to compile and publish on its website all reports submitted to the department detailing all opioids sold by a registrant in the state of New York including the initial report with transaction information from July 1, 2019 through December 31, 2019 and each annual report thereafter within ninety days.
Title
Requires the department of health to publish certain reports on the department's website detailing sales of opioids sold in the state; requires the department of health to compile and publish on its website all reports submitted to the department detailing all opioids sold by a registrant in the state of New York including the initial report with transaction information from July 1, 2019 through December 31, 2019 and each annual report thereafter within ninety days.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Assembly | substituted by s7378a |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8339a |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2022-04-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | recalled from senate |
2022-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.391 |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
2021-10-20 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07378 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.70