NY A08327 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - substituted by s7453a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - substituted by s7453a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the electric landscaping equipment rebate program to reduce greenhouse gas emissions, improve air quality, and reduce noise pollution by promoting the adoption of quieter, zero-emission landscaping equipment; provides for rebates at the point of sale for applicants purchasing or leasing certain equipment; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Title
Establishes the electric landscaping equipment rebate program to reduce greenhouse gas emissions, improve air quality, and reduce noise pollution by promoting the adoption of quieter, zero-emission landscaping equipment; provides for rebates at the point of sale for applicants purchasing or leasing certain equipment; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Assembly | substituted by s7453a |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | rules report cal.88 |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | print number 8327a |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-10-20 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S07453 (Same As) 2022-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.184