NY A08325 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-3)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - print number 8325a
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - print number 8325a
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the creation of a searchable database; requires the Urban Development Corporation to create or modify an existing searchable database including information on qualified participants receiving state economic development benefits.
Title
Relates to the creation of a searchable database; requires the Urban Development Corporation to create or modify an existing searchable database including information on qualified participants receiving state economic development benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Assembly | print number 8325a |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2021-10-20 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S05711 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE