NY A08325 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-24 - substituted by s5474

Summary

Relates to pilotage rates at Sandy Hook, Sands Point and Execution Rocks; increases rates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to pilotage rates at Sandy Hook, Sands Point and Execution Rocks; increases rates.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-24 substituted by s5474
2010-06-24 rules report cal.333
2010-06-24 reported
2010-06-24 reported referred to rules
2010-06-15 reported referred to ways and means
2010-01-06 referred to transportation
2009-06-18 reported referred to rules
2009-06-16 reported referred to ways and means
2009-05-15 referred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S5474 (Same As) 2010-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.537

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback