NY A08322 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - signed chap.542
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - signed chap.542
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to designating the ombudsman as an employee of the commissioner on quality of care and advocacy for persons with disabilities.
Title
Relates to designating the ombudsman as an employee of the commissioner on quality of care and advocacy for persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Schroeder [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Joseph Lentol [D] | Asm. Jonathan Bing [D] |
Asm. Harvey Weisenberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Senate | signed chap.542 |
2011-09-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1507 |
2011-06-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5792 |
2011-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.541 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.541 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S05792 (Same As) 2011-06-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8322