NY A08315 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.240
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.240
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to proceedings against juvenile and adolescent offenders and allowing district attorneys to remove such offenders to family court.
Title
Relates to proceedings against juvenile and adolescent offenders and allowing district attorneys to remove such offenders to family court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.240 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.534 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8315 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1741 |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6550 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.534 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.534 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06550 (Same As) 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.240