NY A08306 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - signed chap.194
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - signed chap.194
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits insurers to make available multiple rating programs for commercial insurance within the same company.
Title
Permits insurers to make available multiple rating programs for commercial insurance within the same company.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Assembly | signed chap.194 |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-03-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.488 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3572 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.439 |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-10-20 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S03572 (Same As) 2022-03-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8306