NY A08305 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of beverage containers connected to each other by a separate holding device constructed of plastic.
Title
Prohibits the sale of beverage containers connected to each other by a separate holding device constructed of plastic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-10-23 | Assembly | print number 8305a |
2019-10-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06647 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION