NY A08305 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.261
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.261
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Mohawk to extend the town of Mohawk Fire District into the village of Fonda.
Title
Authorizes the town of Mohawk to extend the town of Mohawk Fire District into the village of Fonda.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Senate | signed chap.261 |
2014-08-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1488 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6162A |
2014-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.275 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.275 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-02-26 | Assembly | print number 8305a |
2014-02-26 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2013-12-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06162 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8305A