NY A08300 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - signed chap.434
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - signed chap.434
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation would exempt the weight of auxiliary power units (APU) from the weight restriction of commercial vehicles, up to a maximum of 400 pounds.
Title
Excludes idling reduction devices from the calculation of the weight of certain vehicles, provided that such devices do not increase the vehicle weight by more than 400 pounds and such devices are fully functional.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-30 | signed chap.434 | |
2010-08-18 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-22 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-22 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-17 | 3RD READING CAL.169 | |
2010-06-17 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5722A | |
2010-06-16 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-06-16 | delivered to senate | |
2010-06-16 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-16 | ordered to third reading rules cal.176 | |
2010-06-16 | rules report cal.176 | |
2010-06-16 | reported | |
2010-06-08 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-05-25 | reported referred to codes | |
2010-05-18 | print number 8300a | |
2010-05-18 | amend and recommit to transportation | |
2010-01-06 | referred to transportation | |
2009-05-13 | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S5722 (Same As) 2010-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8300A