NY A08299 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - VETOED MEMO.289
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - VETOED MEMO.289
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to defense and indemnification obligations relating to the Route 9A bikeway/Greenway adjacent to the Hudson river park.
Title
Relates to defense and indemnification obligations relating to the Route 9A bikeway/Greenway adjacent to the Hudson river park.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-31 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.289 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.613 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8299 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1706 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6281A |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6281a |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.613 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.613 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S06281 (Same As) 2019-12-31 - VETOED MEMO.289