NY A08298 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-21 - signed chap.187
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-21 - signed chap.187
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to application for a waiver for entities providing certain professional services; provides that entities in existence as of the effective date of section 6503-a of the education law shall have until February 1, 2012 to apply for a waiver.
Title
Relates to application for a waiver for entities providing certain professional services; provides that entities in existence as of the effective date of section 6503-a of the education law shall have until February 1, 2012 to apply for a waiver.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-21 | Senate | signed chap.187 |
2011-07-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1352 |
2011-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5713 |
2011-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.295 |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.295 |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-10 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S05713 (Same As) 2011-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8298