NY A08296 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - substituted by s6893
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - substituted by s6893
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Broadens the permissible scope of use of certain property conveyed to the Hollis-Bellaire-Queens Village Athletic Association, Inc. by chapter 602 of the laws of 1980 relating to authorizing the commissioner of general services to sell or lease certain lands in Queens county to the Hollis-Bellaire-Queens Village Athletic Association, Inc. and chapter 841 of the laws of 1990 relating to authorizing the commissioner of general services to sell or lease certain lands in Queens county to the Hollis-Bellaire-Queens Village Athletic Association, Inc.
Title
Broadens the permissible scope of use of certain property conveyed to the Hollis-Bellaire-Queens Village Athletic Association, Inc. by chapter 602 of the laws of 1980 relating to authorizing the commissioner of general services to sell or lease certain lands in Queens county to the Hollis-Bellaire-Queens Village Athletic Association, Inc. and chapter 841 of the laws of 1990 relating to authorizing the commissioner of general services to sell or lease certain lands in Queens county to the Hollis-Bellaire-Queens Village Athletic Association, Inc.
Sponsors
Asm. Clyde Vanel [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Assembly | substituted by s6893 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.134 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.134 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-10-20 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06893 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.318