NY A08280 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on September 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes emergency medical technicians to administer certain vaccines pursuant to non-patient specific orders and under the authority of an emergency medical services director after receiving appropriate training; authorizes physicians and certified nurse practitioners to prescribe and order a non-patient specific order to an emergency medical technician to administer certain vaccines; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Title
Authorizes emergency medical technicians to administer certain vaccines pursuant to non-patient specific orders and under the authority of an emergency medical services director after receiving appropriate training; authorizes physicians and certified nurse practitioners to prescribe and order a non-patient specific order to an emergency medical technician to administer certain vaccines; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | print number 8280c |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 8280b |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | print number 8280a |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
2021-09-13 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07366 (Same As) 2022-04-28 - PRINT NUMBER 7366A