NY A08279 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.225
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the authorization of the department of environmental conservation to issue commercial fishing licenses in certain numbers until 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the authorization of the department of environmental conservation to issue commercial fishing licenses in certain numbers until 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-21Senatesigned chap.225
2017-08-09Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.2131
2017-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5747A
2017-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-15Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.423
2017-06-15Assemblyrules report cal.423
2017-06-15Assemblyreported
2017-06-14Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 8279a
2017-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-05Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S05747 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8279A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08279&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08279&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08279
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08279&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08279A
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08279&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08279&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08279&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A8279#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback