NY A08272 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage Atlantic cod.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage Atlantic cod.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-21Senatesigned chap.218
2017-08-09Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1969
2017-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6487
2017-06-13SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-13Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.197
2017-06-12Assemblyrules report cal.197
2017-06-12Assemblyreported
2017-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-05Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S06487 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8272

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08272&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08272&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08272
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08272&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08272&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08272&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A8272#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback