NY A08270 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the New York state climate and community protection act; relates to climate change; renewable energy program; labor and job standards and worker protection.
Title
Enacts the New York state climate and community protection act; relates to climate change; renewable energy program; labor and job standards and worker protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8270b |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.600 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.525 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.525 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | print number 8270a |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06617 (Same As) 2018-03-19 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S07971 (Same As) 2018-03-20 - PRINT NUMBER 7971A
S07971 (Same As) 2018-03-20 - PRINT NUMBER 7971A