NY A08268 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - print number 8268c
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - print number 8268c
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to safety recalls on used motor vehicles; requires dealers to provide notice to purchasers of safety recalls.
Title
Relates to safety recalls on used motor vehicles; requires dealers to provide notice to purchasers of safety recalls.
Sponsors
Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D] | Asm. Dan Quart [D] | Asm. Erik Dilan [D] | Asm. Michael Norris [R] |
Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Catherine Nolan [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Assembly | print number 8268c |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | print number 8268b |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | print number 8268a |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S07545 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES