NY A08257 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.232
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.232
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the making of any change, alteration or modification to any entrance to or exit from a polling place unless such change, alteration or modification is necessary to maintain public safety due to the occurrence of an emergency, and requires the posting of signage relation to such change, alteration or modification.
Title
Prohibits the making of any change, alteration or modification to any entrance to or exit from a polling place unless such change, alteration or modification is necessary to maintain public safety due to the occurrence of an emergency, and requires the posting of signage relation to such change, alteration or modification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.232 |
2020-09-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.177 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8257 |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2020-02-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.257 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | died in assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | referred to election law |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.902 |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5188 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.177 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S05188 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.232