NY A08249 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-02 - print number 8249a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-02 - print number 8249a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires epinephrine auto-injectors in schools; requires training in the administration of epi-pens where a student is reasonably believed to be suffering from anaphylaxis.
Title
Requires epinephrine auto-injectors in schools; requires training in the administration of epi-pens where a student is reasonably believed to be suffering from anaphylaxis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | Assembly | print number 8249a |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2013-11-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06208 (Same As) 2014-05-21 - PRINT NUMBER 6208A