NY A08248 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - print number 8248a
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates a veterans' mental health and suicide prevention task force to examine, evaluate and determine how to improve mental health and suicide prevention for our veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a veterans' mental health and suicide prevention task force to examine, evaluate and determine how to improve mental health and suicide prevention for our veterans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-04Assemblyprint number 8248a
2020-02-04Assemblyamend and recommit to veterans' affairs
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs
2019-06-10Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs

Same As/Similar To

S02248 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback