NY A08247 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-11-22 - signed chap.476
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the intravenous administration of contrast media when such administration is an integral part of the x-ray or imaging procedure by a radiographer when done under the direct supervision of a licensed physician, certified nurse practitioner, or licensed physician assistant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the intravenous administration of contrast media when such administration is an integral part of the x-ray or imaging procedure by a radiographer when done under the direct supervision of a licensed physician, certified nurse practitioner, or licensed physician assistant.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-11-22Assemblysigned chap.476
2024-11-15Assemblydelivered to governor
2024-06-06SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-06-06Senate3RD READING CAL.454
2024-06-06SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8470A
2024-03-21SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2024-03-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2024-03-21Assemblypassed assembly
2024-03-11Assemblyamended on third reading 8247c
2024-03-07Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.354
2024-03-05Assemblyreported
2024-03-01Assemblyprint number 8247b
2024-03-01Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to health
2024-02-21Assemblyprint number 8247a
2024-02-21Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to health
2023-11-15Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S08470 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8247C

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A8247
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08247&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08247
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08247&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08247A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08247&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08247B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08247&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08247C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08247&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08247&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A8247#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback